|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 09/02/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6266 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1924 | 02/08/1924 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1927 | 07/01/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1929 | 23/11/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1932 | 24/12/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1935 | 23/03/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1937 | 03/04/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1939 | 26/08/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3376 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1941 | 04/10/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 777 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1928 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21905 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 09/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6266 |
||
09/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
15/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
24/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1924. Dep: 02/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
23/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
18/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
10/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
26/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1927. Dep: 07/01/1928. | ||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 24/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 03/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
12/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3376 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 777 |
||
04/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 777 from Langwith Junction (LNG) |