Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 237 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 237 Week
» 17573 Month
» 295369 Year
» 1179750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1933 m/e 07/1918
LNER (1924) 6263   02/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3817   20/10/1946
BR 63817 w/e 22/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1918
O114/04/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21910
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 02/02/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 44 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 15/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 16/02/1924
DON Doncaster 17/01/1925
FRO Frodingham 05/09/1939
CLK Colwick 24/12/1944
GOR Gorton 03/06/1945
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1198)
10/01/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1366)
06/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1168)
11/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1860)
24/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1464)
04/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3249)
04/07/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
24/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3344)
02/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1864)
26/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3394)
14/04/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5036)
01/03/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5013)
01/07/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5082)
12/05/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28811)
23/01/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28391)
08/01/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28388)
09/02/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28358)
02/12/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28971)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 02/02/1924 1 day Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6263
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1924 10/01/1925 127 days General
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1927 16/07/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 20/04/1929 06/07/1929 78 days General
Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1931 11/07/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1934 24/02/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1936 04/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 24/09/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1940 02/11/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1943 26/06/1943 10 days General
Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1945 14/04/1945 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1945 20/10/1945 21 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 12/01/1947 01/03/1947 49 days General
Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1949 22/01/1949 5 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 63817
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1949 01/07/1949 24 days General
Boiler number 5082 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1949 23/07/1949 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/04/1951 12/05/1951 26 days General
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1952 05/06/1952 52 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/06/1952 09/06/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 29/12/1952 23/01/1953 26 days General
Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1954 30/01/1954 24 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/12/1954 08/01/1955 38 days General
Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1956 20/04/1956 35 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/01/1957 09/02/1957 30 days General
Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1959 01/05/1959 26 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 25/10/1961 02/12/1961 39 days General
Boiler number 28971 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1961 13/12/1961 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1933
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21910
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 02/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6263
   
15/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
06/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1924. Dep: 10/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15)
   
17/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
04/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1927. Dep: 16/07/1927.    
20/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 06/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15)
   
20/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
   
20/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
27/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
12/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945.    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3817    
12/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63817
   
08/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5082 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/07/1949. Dep: 23/07/1949.    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
17/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/04/1952. Dep: 05/06/1952.    
07/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1952. Dep: 09/06/1952.    
29/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 23/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1954. Dep: 30/01/1954.    
02/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1956. Dep: 20/04/1956.    
11/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/04/1959. Dep: 01/05/1959.    
25/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1961. Dep: 02/12/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28971 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1961. Dep: 13/12/1961.    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63817 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev