Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1936 m/e 07/1918
LNER (1924) 6264   09/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3818   13/10/1946
BR 63818 w/e 17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1918
O4/817/06/1947
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21913
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 09/02/1924
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping W George, Station Steel (Wath)
Service Life 47 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Station Steel, Wath, 5/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 16/02/1924
ANN Annesley 04/04/1924
NWE New England 30/01/1925
GRA Grantham 21/02/1933
NWE New England 20/05/1933
CLK Colwick 15/07/1935
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
IMM Immingham 09/12/1945
FRO Frodingham 12/05/1946
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 06/07/1958
36A Doncaster 09/12/1962
   Withdrawn 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1193)
22/01/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1247)
19/09/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1342)
01/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1463)
08/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 934)
15/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1239)
23/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1417)
02/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3386)
22/11/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 828)
24/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1149)
17/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5106)
17/09/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5013)
03/05/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28378)
18/05/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28376)
09/06/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28393)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/02/1924 09/02/1924 7 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6264
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1924 22/01/1925 88 days General
Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1927 08/06/1927 46 days General  
Gorton Works 04/07/1929 19/09/1929 78 days General
Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1932 01/06/1932 37 days General
Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1933 08/07/1933 26 days General
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1935 15/07/1935 48 days General
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1937 23/10/1937 21 days General
Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1940 02/03/1940 43 days General
Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1941 22/11/1941 39 days General
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1944 24/03/1944 36 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1947 17/06/1947 97 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5106 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1949 17/09/1949 30 days General
Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63818
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1952 03/05/1952 35 days General
Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1954 08/10/1954 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 23/04/1957 18/05/1957 26 days General
Boiler number 28376 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1959 09/10/1959 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 10/04/1962 09/06/1962 61 days General
Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1936
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21913
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
03/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1924. Dep: 09/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6264
   
09/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
16/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
27/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1924. Dep: 22/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
24/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1927. Dep: 08/06/1927.    
04/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1929. Dep: 19/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15)
   
26/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1932. Dep: 01/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
20/05/1933 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
13/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
   
29/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1935. Dep: 15/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15)
   
20/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15)
   
15/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1941. Dep: 22/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1944. Dep: 24/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3818    
13/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1947. Dep: 17/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5106 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63818
   
30/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/09/1954. Dep: 08/10/1954.    
23/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28376 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
02/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/09/1959. Dep: 09/10/1959.    
10/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1962. Dep: 09/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63818 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev