|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/02/1924 | 09/02/1924 | 7 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6264 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1924 | 22/01/1925 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1927 | 08/06/1927 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1929 | 19/09/1929 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1932 | 01/06/1932 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1933 | 08/07/1933 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1935 | 15/07/1935 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1937 | 23/10/1937 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1940 | 02/03/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1941 | 22/11/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1944 | 24/03/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1947 | 17/06/1947 | 97 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5106 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1949 | 17/09/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63818 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1954 | 08/10/1954 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28376 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1959 | 09/10/1959 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1962 | 09/06/1962 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1936 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21913 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
03/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1924. Dep: 09/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6264 |
||
09/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
16/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
27/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1924. Dep: 22/01/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
24/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1927. Dep: 08/06/1927. | ||
04/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1929. Dep: 19/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1932. Dep: 01/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/02/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
20/05/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
13/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1935. Dep: 15/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1941. Dep: 22/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1944. Dep: 24/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3818 | ||
13/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1947. Dep: 17/06/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5106 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63818 |
||
30/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/09/1954. Dep: 08/10/1954. | ||
23/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28376 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
02/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/09/1959. Dep: 09/10/1959. | ||
10/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1962. Dep: 09/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63818 from Doncaster (36A) |