Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1937 m/e 07/1918
LNER (1924) 6262   02/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3819   02/11/1946
BR 63819 w/e 12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1918
O4/825/11/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21914
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 02/02/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/11/1965 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 47 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 12/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 05/02/1924
ANN Annesley 21/04/1924
HLS Hull Springhead 15/05/1930
GOR Gorton 28/06/1933
CLK Colwick 16/12/1933
DON Doncaster m/e 1934
LIN Lincoln 12/12/1943
TUX Tuxford 14/12/1947
IMM Immingham 18/12/1949
40E Colwick 09/08/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 07/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TUX Tuxford w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 24/12/1949
WDN   w/e 07/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1189)
29/01/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1173)
17/01/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1158)
25/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1336)
30/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1314)
17/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1285)
15/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1107)
24/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1281)
21/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1256)
25/11/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5028)
02/11/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5027)
12/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5087)
01/09/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28341)
04/02/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28340)
29/09/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28825)
27/11/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28375)
03/01/1963 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28937)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/01/1924 02/02/1924 7 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6262
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1924 29/01/1925 92 days General
Boiler number 1173 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1927 20/01/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 17/12/1929 17/01/1930 32 days General
Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15)
 
Darlington Works 18/05/1932 25/06/1932 39 days General
Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1935 30/03/1935 32 days General
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1937 17/04/1937 31 days General
Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1939 15/07/1939 38 days General
Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1941 24/05/1941 42 days General
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1943 21/08/1943 45 days General
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1944 25/11/1944 55 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1946 02/11/1946 35 days General
Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3819
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1949 12/02/1949 36 days General
Boiler number 5087 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63819
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1951 01/09/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1951 10/09/1951 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/11/1951 01/12/1951 13 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/01/1954 04/02/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 28340 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1956 29/09/1956 51 days General
Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1959 27/11/1959 33 days General
Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1961 27/09/1961 20 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 16/01/1962 24/02/1962 40 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 06/11/1962 03/01/1963 59 days General
Boiler number 28937 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1937
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21914
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
27/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1924. Dep: 02/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6262
   
02/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1924. Dep: 29/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1173 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1927. Dep: 20/01/1928.    
17/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1929. Dep: 17/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15)
   
15/05/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
18/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15)
   
28/06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
1934 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15)
   
13/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
02/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3819
   
14/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
08/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5087 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63819
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
26/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1951. Dep: 10/09/1951.    
19/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951.    
05/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1954. Dep: 04/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28340 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
26/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 27/11/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1961. Dep: 27/09/1961.    
16/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1962. Dep: 24/02/1962.    
06/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1962. Dep: 03/01/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28937 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63819 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev