Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 530 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2437 Week
» 21219 Month
» 269512 Year
» 1153893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1689 m/e 12/1918
LNER (1924) 6552   13/08/1927
LNER (1946) 3709   15/08/1946
BR 63709 w/e 12/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1918
O4/822/02/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3737
To Service During 12/1918
Taken into Stock 12/08/1927
Withdrawal Thu 23/02/1961 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 42 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 12/08/1927
MEX Mexborough 25/07/1943
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
39A Gorton 20/09/1953
   Withdrawn 23/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 25/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1146)
01/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1962)
25/11/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1167)
23/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
23/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1182)
16/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1864)
05/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3231)
08/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1029)
06/10/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3269)
03/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3258)
12/08/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3396)
06/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22879)
12/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22279)
22/02/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28946)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/05/1927 13/08/1927 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6552
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1929 26/10/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 04/07/1931 01/08/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1933 25/11/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1167 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1936 23/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1938 16/07/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1940 05/10/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3231 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1943 08/05/1943 8 days General
Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1945 06/10/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1947 05/04/1947 15 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1947 03/01/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1950 12/08/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63709
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1950 20/08/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/11/1952 06/12/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22879 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1954 12/06/1954 4 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/02/1955 12/03/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1955 02/04/1955 1 day Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1958 22/02/1958 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28946 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1961 18/02/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1689
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3737
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
07/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1927. Dep: 13/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6552
   
12/08/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/08/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
21/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 26/10/1929.    
04/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1931. Dep: 01/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1933. Dep: 25/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1167 (Diagram 15)
   
09/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
02/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
   
28/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3231 (Diagram 15)
   
01/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
   
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
22/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3709    
22/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
13/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 03/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
29/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1950. Dep: 12/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63709
   
19/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1950. Dep: 20/08/1950.    
15/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22879 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
09/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954.    
05/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22279 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
18/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1958. Dep: 22/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28946 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/02/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961.    
23/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63709 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev