Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1691 m/e 01/1919
LNER (1924) 6317   08/03/1924
War Dept. 784   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3739
To Service During 01/1919
Taken into Stock 08/03/1924
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 784 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 14/03/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 20/03/1924
   Withdrawn 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1303)
26/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1385)
18/04/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1021)
15/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1877)
26/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3216)
29/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1135)
07/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1950)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3239)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 08/03/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6317
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 26/07/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1926 31/12/1926 56 days General  
Gorton Works 16/02/1929 16/03/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 04/04/1931 18/04/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1933 15/07/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1935 26/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1938 29/01/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1940 07/09/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1941 11/10/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1691
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3739
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6317
   
08/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
14/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
17/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15)
   
06/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926.    
16/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929.    
04/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1931. Dep: 18/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
   
01/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1935. Dep: 26/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15)
   
24/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
   
30/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 784 from Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
18/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 784    

prev prev