|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/02/1924 | 08/03/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6317 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1924 | 26/07/1924 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1926 | 31/12/1926 | 56 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1929 | 16/03/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1931 | 18/04/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/07/1933 | 15/07/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1935 | 26/10/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1940 | 07/09/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1941 | 11/10/1941 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1691 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3739 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
23/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6317 |
||
08/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
14/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
17/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. | ||
16/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929. | ||
04/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1931. Dep: 18/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1935. Dep: 26/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 784 from Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
18/10/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 784 |