Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1692 m/e 01/1919
LNWR 2917 m/e 12/1919
GCR 1334c   05/01/1924
LNER (1924) 6334   19/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3712   01/09/1946
BR 63712 w/e 12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/301/1919
O113/05/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3740
To Service During 01/1919
Taken into Stock 05/01/1924
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 12/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 02/01/1924
IMM Immingham 03/05/1924
GOR Gorton 21/05/1944
TDK Tyne Dock 11/06/1944
HLS Hull Springhead 18/06/1945
TDK Tyne Dock 21/03/1946
DAR Darlington 06/02/1949
HLD Hull Dairycoates 11/09/1949
53C Hull Springhead 05/02/1950
53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
54B Tyne Dock 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 02/09/1951
WDN   26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1145)
19/04/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1958)
16/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1882)
13/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1050)
28/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3236)
21/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 946)
01/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 854)
04/04/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1149)
13/05/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9432)
26/10/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5005)
12/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5008)
12/02/1949 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
06/10/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28350)
26/04/1952 Westinghouse Brake fitted
26/04/1952 Vacuum Ejector fitted
17/04/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28832)
22/12/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28355)
08/09/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28842)
08/09/1962 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 05/01/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1334c
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 19/04/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1958 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6334
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1926 17/04/1926 64 days General  
Gorton Works 26/05/1928 30/06/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 26/07/1930 16/08/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1933 13/05/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1936 28/03/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1938 21/05/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1940 01/06/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1942 04/04/1942 16 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1944 13/05/1944 86 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1946 26/10/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 1949 06/10/1949   Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/01/1949 12/02/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 5008 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63712
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1951 06/10/1951 29 days General
Boiler number 28350 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1952 26/04/1952 43 days Light Casual
Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1952 29/11/1952 15 days Light Casual
New L H cylinder
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1954 17/04/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1956 22/12/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1960 20/02/1960 43 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 07/07/1962 08/09/1962 64 days General
Boiler number 28842 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1962 23/11/1962 11 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1692
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3740
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2917    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1334c
   
02/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1958 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6334
   
03/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1926. Dep: 17/04/1926.    
26/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928.    
26/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
   
29/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15)
   
14/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
   
18/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1942. Dep: 04/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
   
18/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/06/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
18/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
21/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3712    
28/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A)
   
1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1949. Dep: 06/10/1949.    
29/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5008 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63712
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
08/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28350 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
15/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
New L H cylinder
   
20/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/01/1960. Dep: 20/02/1960.    
07/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1962. Dep: 08/09/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28842 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
13/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1962. Dep: 23/11/1962.    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63712 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev