|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1923 | 05/01/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1334c |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 19/04/1924 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1958 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6334 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1926 | 17/04/1926 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1928 | 30/06/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1930 | 16/08/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1933 | 13/05/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1936 | 28/03/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1938 | 21/05/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1940 | 01/06/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1942 | 04/04/1942 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1944 | 13/05/1944 | 86 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 1949 | 06/10/1949 | Light Casual | ||||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1949 | 12/02/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 5008 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63712 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28350 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1952 | 26/04/1952 | 43 days | Light Casual | Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic Vacuum Ejector fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1952 | 29/11/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | New L H cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1954 | 17/04/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1956 | 22/12/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1960 | 20/02/1960 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1962 | 08/09/1962 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 28842 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1962 | 23/11/1962 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1692 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3740 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2917 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
22/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1334c |
||
02/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/01/1924 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1958 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6334 |
||
03/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
13/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1926. Dep: 17/04/1926. | ||
26/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928. | ||
26/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1050 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1942. Dep: 04/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
18/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
21/03/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3712 | ||
28/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5005 (Diagram 100A) |
||
1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1949. Dep: 06/10/1949. | ||
29/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5008 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63712 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
08/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28350 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952. Work undertaken: Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic Vacuum Ejector fitted |
||
15/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952. Work undertaken: New L H cylinder |
||
20/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/01/1960. Dep: 20/02/1960. | ||
07/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1962. Dep: 08/09/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28842 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
13/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1962. Dep: 23/11/1962. | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63712 from Tyne Dock (52H) |