Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1693 m/e 01/1919
LNER (1924) 6553   12/11/1927
LNER (1946) 3713   23/03/1946
BR (Tmp) E3713   28/02/1948
BR 63713 w/e 08/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3741
To Service During 01/1919
Taken into Stock 14/11/1927
Withdrawal Fri 10/08/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/8/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WFD Woodford Halse 14/11/1927
DON Doncaster 24/09/1928
MEX Mexborough 22/10/1928
WFD Woodford Halse 16/11/1928
LNG Langwith Junction 03/08/1943
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 11/04/1948
CLK Colwick 30/01/1949
38B Annesley 05/02/1950
39A Gorton 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn 10/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 02/07/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 11/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1216)
05/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1178)
16/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1250)
20/02/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1181)
28/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1280)
05/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 811)
01/07/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3347)
23/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 856)
28/02/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3405)
17/12/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3213)
10/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22267)
07/08/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22259)
17/11/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22203)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/08/1927 12/11/1927 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6553
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1930 15/03/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 29/10/1932 05/11/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1935 16/02/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1937 20/02/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1939 28/10/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1942 05/09/1942 13 days General
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1944 01/07/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1946 23/03/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3713
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1948 28/02/1948 15 days General
Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3713
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1949 08/10/1949 1 day Light Casual
Tender only
Renumbered to BR 63713
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1949 17/12/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1952 10/05/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22267 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1954 07/08/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1956 11/02/1956 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 20/10/1956 17/11/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1960 18/06/1960 78 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1693
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3741
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1927. Dep: 12/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6553
   
14/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
14/11/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
24/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
08/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930.    
29/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15)
   
09/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
   
14/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
   
24/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
17/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
   
02/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3713
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3713
   
11/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
Renumbered to BR 63713
   
26/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
19/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22267 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1954. Dep: 07/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956.    
20/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960.    
10/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63713 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev