|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/08/1927 | 12/11/1927 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6553 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1930 | 15/03/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1932 | 05/11/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1935 | 16/02/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1937 | 20/02/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1939 | 28/10/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1942 | 05/09/1942 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3713 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1948 | 28/02/1948 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3713 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1949 | 08/10/1949 | 1 day | Light Casual | Tender only Renumbered to BR 63713 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1949 | 17/12/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1952 | 10/05/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22267 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1954 | 07/08/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1956 | 11/02/1956 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1956 | 17/11/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1960 | 18/06/1960 | 78 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1693 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3741 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
20/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1927. Dep: 12/11/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6553 |
||
14/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
14/11/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
24/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
08/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930. | ||
29/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
17/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3713 |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3713 |
||
11/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
17/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
05/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949. Work undertaken: Tender only Renumbered to BR 63713 |
||
26/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
19/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22267 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1954. Dep: 07/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956. | ||
20/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960. | ||
10/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63713 from Gorton (9G) |