Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1694 m/e 01/1919
LNER (1924) 6316   12/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3714   31/03/1946
BR 63714 w/e 11/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3742
To Service During 01/1919
Taken into Stock 12/04/1924
Withdrawal Fri 20/03/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 21/3/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 10/04/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 22/10/1924
SHF Sheffield Darnall 11/04/1943
   Withdrawn 20/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   20/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1389)
27/09/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1429)
28/05/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 803)
12/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1062)
17/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1034)
11/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3250)
16/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1104)
28/03/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 807)
03/06/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3414)
16/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3263)
11/02/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 811)
05/07/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22275)
07/05/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22269)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 12/04/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6316
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1924 27/09/1924 85 days General
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1927 28/05/1927 92 days General
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 24/09/1929 60 days General  
Gorton Works 21/11/1931 12/12/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1934 17/03/1934 8 days General
Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1936 11/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1939 16/09/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1942 28/03/1942 16 days General
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1944 03/06/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1945 22/12/1945 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/02/1946 23/02/1946 8 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1947 16/08/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1950 11/02/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63714
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1952 05/07/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22275 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1955 07/05/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22269 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1694
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3742
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
29/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6316
   
10/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1924. Dep: 27/09/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
   
22/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
26/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 28/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
   
27/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 24/09/1929.    
21/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
   
10/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1939. Dep: 16/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
   
13/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
20/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945.    
16/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
31/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3714    
26/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
   
21/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1950. Dep: 11/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63714
   
14/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22275 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22269 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63714 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev