|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/05/1924 | 14/06/1924 | 30 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6333 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1925 | 04/02/1926 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1928 | 20/09/1928 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1930 | 24/07/1930 | 72 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1932 | 09/12/1932 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1935 | 09/03/1935 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1937 | 05/03/1937 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1939 | 13/05/1939 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1941 | 31/05/1941 | 44 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1943 | 17/04/1943 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63715 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1950 | 06/01/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1955 | 04/06/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1957 | 18/01/1958 | 71 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28943 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1958 | 19/04/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1958 | 05/07/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1958 | 27/09/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1960 | 26/11/1960 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1695 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3743 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2898 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
16/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6333 |
||
12/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/06/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
10/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1925. Dep: 04/02/1926. | ||
22/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1928. Dep: 20/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1930. Dep: 24/07/1930. | ||
25/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1932. Dep: 09/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1937. Dep: 05/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941. | ||
31/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
21/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3715 | ||
02/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63715 |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
08/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1950. Dep: 06/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 18/01/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28943 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958. | ||
25/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958. | ||
16/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1958. Dep: 27/09/1958. | ||
24/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/10/1960. Dep: 26/11/1960. | ||
28/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63715 from Langwith Junction (41J) |