Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1085 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7475 Week
» 36973 Month
» 373819 Year
» 1595384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1695 m/e 02/1919
London and North Western Railway 2898 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6333   14/06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3715   28/07/1946
British Railways 63715 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1919
O4/818/01/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3743
To Service During 02/1919
Taken into Stock 14/06/1924
Withdrawal Tue 28/01/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 44 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 5/3/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1919
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton on 12/06/1924
DON Doncaster on 28/09/1928
MEX Mexborough on 25/07/1943
40E Langwith Junction on 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn on 28/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
WDN   on 28/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1306)
20/09/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 927)
09/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1155)
09/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1266)
05/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3275)
13/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1937)
17/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1049)
01/12/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3281)
05/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 815)
06/01/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22150)
21/03/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22167)
04/06/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22881)
18/01/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28943)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/05/1924 14/06/1924 30 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6333
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1925 04/02/1926 57 days General  
Gorton Works 22/06/1928 20/09/1928 91 days General
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1930 24/07/1930 72 days General  
Gorton Works 25/10/1932 09/12/1932 46 days General
Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1935 09/03/1935 34 days General
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1937 05/03/1937 32 days General
Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1939 13/05/1939 42 days General
Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1941 31/05/1941 44 days General  
Gorton Works 31/01/1943 17/04/1943 77 days General
Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1945 01/12/1945 72 days General
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1948 05/06/1948 35 days General
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63715
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1950 06/01/1951 30 days General
Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1953 21/03/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1955 04/06/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1957 18/01/1958 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28943 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1958 19/04/1958 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/06/1958 05/07/1958 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/09/1958 27/09/1958 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/10/1960 26/11/1960 34 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1695
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3743
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2898    
08/1921 Allocation      
16/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6333
   
12/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1925. Dep: 04/02/1926.    
22/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1928. Dep: 20/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
   
28/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1930. Dep: 24/07/1930.    
25/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1932. Dep: 09/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15)
   
04/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15)
   
02/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1937. Dep: 05/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15)
   
18/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941.    
31/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
   
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
21/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3715    
02/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63715
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
08/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1950. Dep: 06/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15)
   
23/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22881 (Diagram 15)
   
09/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 18/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28943 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958.    
25/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958.    
16/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1958. Dep: 27/09/1958.    
24/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/10/1960. Dep: 26/11/1960.    
28/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63715 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev