|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/03/1924 | 29/03/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6310 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1924 | 21/06/1924 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1926 | 19/02/1927 | 51 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1929 | 13/07/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1931 | 09/05/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1933 | 17/06/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1935 | 29/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1936 | 17/10/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1939 | 02/09/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1942 | 14/02/1942 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1947 | 05/04/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63716 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1951 | 26/05/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22188 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1953 | 14/03/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22121 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22896 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1957 | 19/10/1957 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1960 | 06/07/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1696 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3744 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
15/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6310 |
||
29/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1926. Dep: 19/02/1927. | ||
25/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
12/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1942. Dep: 14/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3716 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
26/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63716 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
05/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22188 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22121 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22896 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957. | ||
06/07/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63716 from Gorton (9G) | ||
06/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 06/07/1960. Dep: 06/07/1960. |