Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1699 m/e 03/1919
LNER (1924) 6313   29/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3718   25/08/1946
BR 63718 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1919
O4/809/06/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3747
To Service During 03/1919
Taken into Stock 29/03/1924
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 43 yrs , 10 mths

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 19/8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 27/03/1924
CLK Colwick 05/04/1924
NWE New England 27/11/1925
MAR March 14/03/1932
CAM Cambridge 22/12/1947
MAR March 29/03/1948
36C Frodingham 26/03/1950
36D Barnsley 17/08/1952
41J Langwith Junction 29/11/1959
41F Mexborough 28/02/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 10/12/1961
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC MAR March w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 01/04/1950
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 19/03/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 3w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1339)
07/02/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1218)
30/01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 821)
14/04/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1318)
04/04/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1942)
04/04/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
05/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1129)
21/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3236)
15/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1943)
27/10/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3298)
05/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3253)
23/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22144)
03/01/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22109)
09/06/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28273)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 29/03/1924 22 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6313
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1924 07/02/1925 78 days General
Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1927 02/07/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 09/11/1929 14/12/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 09/01/1932 30/01/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1934 14/04/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/03/1936 04/04/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1936 19/12/1936 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 20/10/1938 05/11/1938 17 days General
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1940 21/12/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 10/04/1943 15/05/1943 36 days General
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1944 26/02/1944 9 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/09/1945 27/10/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1947 28/06/1947 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 15/05/1948 05/06/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63718
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1950 23/12/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1952 03/01/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1956 09/06/1956 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1958 19/04/1958 43 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/08/1958 09/08/1958 1 day Light Casual  
Gorton Works 26/03/1960 07/05/1960 43 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 14/05/1960 21/05/1960 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1699
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3747
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6313
   
27/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15)
   
27/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
21/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1927. Dep: 02/07/1927.    
09/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929.    
09/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 30/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
   
14/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
24/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
   
21/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
12/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936.    
20/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
   
07/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
   
10/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
   
18/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944.    
29/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
   
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3718    
14/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947.    
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
29/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
15/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63718
   
26/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
02/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
06/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1952. Dep: 03/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15)
   
31/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1956. Dep: 09/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958.    
09/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1958. Dep: 09/08/1958.    
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
28/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
26/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/03/1960. Dep: 07/05/1960.    
14/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960.    
10/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63718 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev