Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 110 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1347 Week
» 3929 Month
» 268562 Year
» 1490127 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1948 m/e 10/1918
GCR 1259c   19/01/1924
LNER (1924) 6259   12/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3822   20/12/1946
BR 63822 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1918
O4/824/12/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22006
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 19/01/1924
Withdrawal Fri 20/03/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 45 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1918
GOR Gorton 02/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 14/02/1924
41F Mexborough 16/06/1963
41H Staveley (G.C.) 01/03/1964
   Withdrawn 20/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   20/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1164)
12/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1379)
14/05/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1469)
24/02/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 42)
26/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 815)
09/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1118)
24/12/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1027)
08/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 946)
24/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1129)
11/05/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3349)
17/04/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1281)
09/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22102)
07/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22117)
14/10/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22882)
24/12/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28977)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 13/01/1924 19/01/1924 7 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1259c
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1924 12/07/1924 60 days General
Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6259
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1926 28/12/1926 61 days General  
Gorton Works 14/01/1929 14/05/1929 121 days General
Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1930 24/02/1931 65 days General
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1933 26/05/1933 40 days General
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1935 09/08/1935 33 days General
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1937 24/12/1937 23 days General
Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1940 08/06/1940 17 days General
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1943 24/07/1943 48 days General
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1946 11/05/1946 63 days General
Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1948 17/04/1948 48 days General
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63822
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1950 09/09/1950 27 days General
Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1953 07/02/1953 24 days General
Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1953 12/02/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/09/1955 14/10/1955 44 days General
Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1955 19/10/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 29/10/1958 24/12/1958 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28977 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1958 05/01/1959 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/12/1959 31/12/1959 20 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1948
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22006
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
13/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1924. Dep: 19/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1259c
   
19/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
02/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
14/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6259
   
29/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1926. Dep: 28/12/1926.    
14/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1929. Dep: 14/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1930. Dep: 24/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
   
17/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1933. Dep: 26/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1935. Dep: 09/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
   
07/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
   
10/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15)
   
20/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3822    
01/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1948. Dep: 17/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63822
   
14/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15)
   
15/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953.    
01/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1955. Dep: 14/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1955. Dep: 19/10/1955.    
29/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1958. Dep: 24/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28977 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1958. Dep: 05/01/1959.    
12/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1959. Dep: 31/12/1959.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
01/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
20/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63822 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev