Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1949 m/e 10/1918
LNWR 2944 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6608   30/06/1928
LNER (1946) 3823   22/12/1946
BR 63823 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1918
O4/802/11/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22007
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 30/06/1928
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 18/8/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
HLD Hull Dairycoates 30/06/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 02/01/1930
WHL West Hartlepool 17/05/1940
HLD Hull Dairycoates 05/03/1945
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 02/09/1951
40B Immingham 16/09/1951
40D Tuxford 09/11/1952
37A Ardsley 27/09/1953
   Withdrawn 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 22/09/1951
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1948)
07/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1005)
06/04/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1115)
19/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1254)
24/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1004)
04/04/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1225)
17/06/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 862)
03/08/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3291)
11/09/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1231)
08/09/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22213)
16/01/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22197)
02/11/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28937)
27/05/1961 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/03/1928 30/06/1928 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6608
 
Darlington Works 27/06/1930 16/09/1930 82 days General  
Gorton Works 24/12/1932 07/01/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1933 07/10/1933 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/03/1935 06/04/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1937 19/06/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1940 24/02/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1942 04/04/1942 12 days General
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1944 17/06/1944 8 days General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1946 03/08/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1947 21/06/1947 29 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 14/08/1948 11/09/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63823
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1951 08/09/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22213 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1953 16/01/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1954 27/01/1954 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 28/09/1957 02/11/1957 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28937 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1961 27/05/1961 36 days Heavy Intermediate
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1949
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22007
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2944    
08/1921 Allocation      
31/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6608
   
30/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
30/06/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
02/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
27/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1930. Dep: 16/09/1930.    
24/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933.    
23/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
   
03/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15)
   
17/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
24/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1942. Dep: 04/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
   
10/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
   
05/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
29/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3823    
24/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947.    
14/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 11/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63823
   
18/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22213 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
16/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
19/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 15)
   
19/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 27/01/1954.    
28/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28937 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/04/1961. Dep: 27/05/1961.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63823 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev