Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 234 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5578 Week
» 6468 Month
» 314449 Year
» 1198830 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1952 m/e 11/1918
LNWR 2889 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6516   20/03/1926
LNER (1946) 3824   01/12/1946
BR (Tmp) E3824   24/01/1948
BR 63824 w/e 05/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1918
O4/705/06/1943
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22010
To Service During 11/1918
Taken into Stock 20/03/1926
Withdrawal Sun 16/06/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 17/7/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 18/03/1926
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 28/03/1926
FRO Frodingham 09/06/1939
36D Barnsley 02/03/1952
36C Frodingham 22/11/1959
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31/01/1960
   Withdrawn 16/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   16/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1512)
12/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1110)
04/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1276)
29/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1282)
21/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1885)
17/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3383)
05/06/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3693)
20/10/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3688)
24/01/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 5103)
04/08/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3666)
31/01/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22330)
18/08/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22302)
13/10/1960 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22306)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/03/1926   General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1928 02/10/1928 65 days General  
Gorton Works 16/06/1930 12/08/1930 58 days General
Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1933 04/03/1933 41 days General
Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1935 29/06/1935 41 days General
Boiler number 1282 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1937 21/08/1937 17 days General
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1938 29/01/1938 17 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 06/02/1940 17/02/1940 12 days General
Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1943 05/06/1943 34 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1945 20/10/1945 42 days General
Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1947 24/01/1948 42 days General
Boiler number 5103 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3824
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1950 04/08/1950 53 days General
Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63824
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1950 15/08/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/01/1953 31/01/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1953 17/02/1953 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/01/1956 18/02/1956 26 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/06/1956 18/08/1956 70 days General
Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1956 25/08/1956 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/08/1960 13/10/1960 59 days General
Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1952
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22010
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2889    
08/1921 Allocation      
18/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/03/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6516    
20/03/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
20/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: 20/03/1926.    
28/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
30/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1928. Dep: 02/10/1928.    
16/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1930. Dep: 12/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1282 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938.    
09/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
06/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D)
   
09/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3824    
14/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1947. Dep: 24/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5103 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3824
   
13/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1950. Dep: 04/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63824
   
14/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1950. Dep: 15/08/1950.    
02/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
01/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D)
   
10/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 17/02/1953.    
24/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956.    
10/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956.    
22/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
16/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1960. Dep: 13/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D)
   
16/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63824 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev