|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/03/1926 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1928 | 02/10/1928 | 65 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1930 | 12/08/1930 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1933 | 04/03/1933 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1935 | 29/06/1935 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1282 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1937 | 21/08/1937 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1940 | 17/02/1940 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 34 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1947 | 24/01/1948 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 5103 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3824 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1950 | 04/08/1950 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63824 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1950 | 15/08/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1953 | 31/01/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1953 | 17/02/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1956 | 18/08/1956 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1956 | 25/08/1956 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1960 | 13/10/1960 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1952 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22010 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2889 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
18/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/03/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6516 | ||
20/03/1926 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
20/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: 20/03/1926. | ||
28/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
30/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1928. Dep: 02/10/1928. | ||
16/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1930. Dep: 12/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1282 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. | ||
09/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
06/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3693 (Diagram 15D) |
||
09/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3824 | ||
14/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1947. Dep: 24/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5103 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3824 |
||
13/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1950. Dep: 04/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63824 |
||
14/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1950. Dep: 15/08/1950. | ||
02/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
01/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D) |
||
10/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 17/02/1953. | ||
24/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. | ||
10/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D) |
||
20/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956. | ||
22/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
16/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1960. Dep: 13/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D) |
||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63824 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |