Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 131 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 14432 Month
» 292228 Year
» 1176609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1953 m/e 11/1918
LNER (1924) 6508   08/08/1925
War Dept. 750   05/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22011
To Service During 11/1918
Taken into Stock 08/08/1925
Withdrawal Sun 05/10/1941 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)
Service Life 22 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 750 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 18/I0/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 06/08/1925
DON Doncaster 15/08/1925
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 07/04/1933
   Withdrawn 05/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1151)
03/05/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1028)
05/03/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1863)
11/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1005)
19/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1287)
22/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1475)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1228)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/05/1925 08/08/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6508
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1928 10/03/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 05/04/1930 03/05/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1932 05/03/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1935 11/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1937 19/06/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1939 22/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number C1475 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1941 27/09/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1228 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1953
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22011
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 08/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6508
   
06/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/08/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
04/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1928. Dep: 10/03/1928.    
05/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15)
   
20/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
27/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1475 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1228 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 750 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
05/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 750    

prev prev