Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 715 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 5153 Month
» 313134 Year
» 1197515 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1954 m/e 11/1918
LNER (1924) 6509   22/08/1925
War Dept. 704   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22012
To Service During 11/1918
Taken into Stock 22/08/1924
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Grantham (GRA)
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 704 and sent to the Middle East via Birkenhead, 12/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 20/08/1925
DON Doncaster 02/09/1925
NWE New England 09/01/1926
GRA Grantham 14/09/1935
NWE New England 29/11/1935
CLK Colwick 18/12/1935
GRA Grantham 20/04/1940
   Withdrawn 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1030)
01/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 872)
25/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 814)
21/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 549)
07/11/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 820)
06/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 546)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/05/1925 22/08/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6509
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1927 10/12/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 08/02/1930 01/03/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1932 25/06/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1934 21/07/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1936 07/11/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1939 10/06/1939 22 days General  
Gorton Works 15/08/1941 06/09/1941 23 days General
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1954
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22012
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/08/1924 To Stock To ROD stock    
30/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1925. Dep: 22/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6509
   
20/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
09/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
05/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927.    
08/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
   
11/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
   
14/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
29/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
18/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
31/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1939. Dep: 10/06/1939.    
20/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
15/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 704 from Grantham (GRA)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 704    

prev prev