Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 3877 Week
» 21213 Month
» 299009 Year
» 1183390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1956 m/e 11/1918
LNWR 2945 m/e 12/1919
GCR 1306c   28/12/1923
LNER (1924) 6306   31/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3827   24/11/1946
BR 63827 w/e 22/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1918
O4/821/07/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22014
To Service During 11/1918
Taken into Stock 28/12/1923
Withdrawal Sun 12/01/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 45 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 28/12/1923
19D Heaton Mersey 26/10/1940
GOR Gorton 02/12/1940
CLK Colwick 17/01/1945
ANN Annesley 23/05/1948
38D Staveley (G.C.) 17/09/1950
   Withdrawn 12/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) w/e 17/09/1950
WDN   12/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1135)
31/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 548)
22/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1214)
20/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1965)
05/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1325)
04/07/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
04/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 588)
05/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 811)
03/08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3323)
09/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1858)
21/07/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5019)
09/10/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5038)
22/10/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5106)
01/12/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28365)
26/06/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28373)
24/08/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28852)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 28/12/1923 7 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1306c
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1924 31/07/1924 77 days General
Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6306
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1926 27/08/1926 99 days General  
Gorton Works 02/05/1928 21/06/1928 51 days General  
Gorton Works 31/05/1930 22/07/1930 53 days General
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1932 20/08/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1934 05/07/1934 34 days General
Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1936 04/07/1936 23 days General
Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1938 05/11/1938 33 days General
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1940 03/08/1940 17 days General
Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1942 09/01/1943 28 days General
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1944 21/07/1944 40 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5019 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1947 09/10/1947 42 days General
Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1949 22/10/1949 33 days General
Boiler number 5106 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63827
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1951 01/12/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1951 10/12/1951 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 13/05/1954 26/06/1954 45 days General
Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1954 08/07/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/07/1957 24/08/1957 50 days General
Boiler number 28852 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1957 31/08/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/06/1961 04/08/1961 63 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1956
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22014
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2945    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 28/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1306c
   
28/12/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/12/1923 To Stock To GCR stock    
16/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 31/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6306
   
21/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1926. Dep: 27/08/1926.    
02/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1928. Dep: 21/06/1928.    
31/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 22/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
   
02/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 05/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
04/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
02/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1944. Dep: 21/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5019 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3827    
29/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5106 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63827
   
17/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
25/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1951. Dep: 10/12/1951.    
13/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1954. Dep: 08/07/1954.    
06/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28852 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957.    
03/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1961. Dep: 04/08/1961.    
12/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63827 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev