Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1957 m/e 12/1918
LNWR 2946 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6609   22/09/1928
LNER (1946) 3828   24/11/1946
BR 63828 w/e 18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1918
O4/830/09/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22015
To Service During 12/1918
Taken into Stock 22/09/1928
Withdrawal Sun 29/08/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
Service Life 46 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Garnham, Harris & Elton, Chesterfield, 10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
HLD Hull Dairycoates 22/09/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 18/11/1929
DAR Darlington 06/01/1940
HTN Heaton 24/02/1940
TDK Tyne Dock 23/07/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates 06/02/1949
36A Doncaster 02/09/1951
36B Mexborough 28/10/1951
40B Immingham 22/09/1952
36B Mexborough 05/10/1952
41J Langwith Junction 03/09/1961
   Withdrawn 29/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
LOAN 36A Doncaster 02/09/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 29/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1037)
04/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1228)
18/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1286)
06/02/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3274)
15/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3298)
28/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3227)
17/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1280)
30/09/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5023)
16/09/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5079)
28/04/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28313)
13/08/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28377)
02/08/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28396)
23/11/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28511)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 22/09/1928 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6609
 
Darlington Works 30/08/1930 18/10/1930 50 days General  
Gorton Works 11/01/1933 04/02/1933 25 days General
Boiler number 1228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1934 18/01/1935 42 days General
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1937 06/02/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1939 15/07/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1940 28/09/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1942 17/10/1942 29 days General
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1944 25/03/1944 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/08/1944 30/09/1944 58 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5023 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1946 17/08/1946 59 days General  
Gorton Works 10/08/1948 16/09/1948 38 days General
Boiler number 5079 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63828
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1951 28/04/1951 40 days General
Boiler number 28313 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1954 13/08/1954 46 days General
Boiler number 28377 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1958 02/08/1958 55 days General
Boiler number 28396 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1962 23/11/1962 36 days General
Boiler number 28511 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 15/12/1964 20/02/1965 68 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1957
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22015
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2946    
08/1921 Allocation      
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 22/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6609
   
22/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
22/09/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
30/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930.    
11/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1228 (Diagram 15)
   
08/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 18/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1937. Dep: 06/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
24/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
24/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 15)
   
19/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944.    
04/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5023 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
20/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3828    
10/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 16/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5079 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63828
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
20/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1951. Dep: 28/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28313 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
28/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
29/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1954. Dep: 13/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28377 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28396 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
19/10/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1962. Dep: 23/11/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28511 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/12/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1964. Dep: 20/02/1965.    
29/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63828 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev