Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1959 m/e 12/1918
LNWR 2947 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6304   16/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3829   03/11/1946
BR 63829 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1918
O4/831/05/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22017
To Service During 12/1918
Taken into Stock 16/02/1924
Withdrawal Thu 12/03/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 45 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 1/4/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 23/02/1924
IMM Immingham 01/03/1924
LIN Lincoln m/e 1928
MEX Mexborough 18/06/1932
IMM Immingham 16/09/1945
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
WFD Woodford Halse 18/08/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 01/02/1948
ANN Annesley 19/09/1948
CLK Colwick 18/12/1949
ANN Annesley 08/01/1950
38A Colwick 23/04/1950
38B Annesley 08/10/1950
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
38A Colwick 13/06/1954
41J Langwith Junction 12/10/1958
   Withdrawn 12/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 25/09/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 23/04/1950
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   12/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1521)
08/05/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 964)
07/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1365)
03/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1102)
12/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1350)
31/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1021)
06/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1353)
12/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 929)
15/12/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 825)
04/09/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3408)
29/07/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3350)
30/08/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22290)
07/05/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22295)
31/05/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28827)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/01/1924 16/02/1924 22 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6304
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1926 13/03/1926 50 days General  
Gorton Works 13/03/1928 08/05/1928 57 days General
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1930 07/08/1930 74 days General
Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1932 03/06/1932 28 days General
Rail washing gear fitted
Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1935 12/06/1935 66 days General
Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1936 14/03/1936 55 days General  
Gorton Works 18/07/1938 31/08/1938 45 days General
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1940 06/07/1940 18 days General
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1943 12/06/1943 32 days General
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1944 23/09/1944 28 days General  
Gorton Works 07/10/1945 15/12/1945 70 days General
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1946 04/05/1946 25 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 19/05/1946 22/06/1946 35 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 22/07/1948 04/09/1948 45 days General
Boiler number 3408 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63829
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1950 29/07/1950 58 days General
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1952 30/08/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22290 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1952 24/09/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/02/1955 07/05/1955 72 days General
Boiler number 22295 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1956 11/02/1956 33 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/04/1958 31/05/1958 37 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1958 18/06/1958 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/03/1960 26/04/1960 41 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1959
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22017
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2947    
08/1921 Allocation      
26/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/01/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6304
   
16/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
23/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
23/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1926. Dep: 13/03/1926.    
1928 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
13/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1928. Dep: 08/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 15)
   
26/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1930. Dep: 07/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1932. Dep: 03/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Rail washing gear fitted
Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15)
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
08/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1935. Dep: 12/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
   
20/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936.    
18/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1938. Dep: 31/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
   
19/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
   
12/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15)
   
27/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944.    
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
07/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
   
10/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946.    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3829    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
01/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3408 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63829
   
19/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
02/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1950. Dep: 29/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
   
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
09/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22290 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 24/09/1952.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22295 (Diagram 15)
   
10/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956.    
25/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1958. Dep: 31/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1958. Dep: 18/06/1958.    
12/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
17/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/03/1960. Dep: 26/04/1960.    
12/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63829 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev