Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 489 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1588 Week
» 7722 Month
» 235606 Year
» 1457171 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1962 m/e 01/1919
LNER (1924) 6610   03/12/1927
War Dept. 729   20/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22020
To Service During 01/1919
Taken into Stock 30/11/1927
Withdrawal Sat 20/09/1941 off Heaton (HTN)
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 729 and sent to the Middle East via Greenock, 8/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1919
HLD Hull Dairycoates 30/11/1927
YK York (North) 15/06/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 04/11/1929
HTN Heaton 24/02/1940
   Withdrawn 20/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1852)
14/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1142)
15/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1107)
31/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3271)
01/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3267)
13/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3234)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/08/1927 03/12/1927 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6610
 
Darlington Works 18/08/1930 17/10/1930 61 days General  
Gorton Works 31/12/1932 14/01/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1934 15/12/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1936 31/12/1936 20 days General
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1939 01/04/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1941 13/09/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1962
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22020
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
27/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6610
   
30/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
30/11/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
15/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
04/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
18/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1930. Dep: 17/10/1930.    
31/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1932. Dep: 14/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15)
   
01/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 01/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15)
   
24/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
01/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 729 from Heaton (HTN)    
20/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 729    

prev prev