|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/08/1927 | 03/12/1927 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6610 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1930 | 17/10/1930 | 61 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1932 | 14/01/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1934 | 15/12/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1936 | 31/12/1936 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1939 | 01/04/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1962 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22020 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
27/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6610 |
||
30/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
30/11/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
15/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
04/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
18/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1930. Dep: 17/10/1930. | ||
31/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1932. Dep: 14/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
12/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 01/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
01/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 729 from Heaton (HTN) | ||
20/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 729 |