Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 464 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 464 Week
» 17800 Month
» 295596 Year
» 1179977 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1963 m/e 01/1919
LNWR 2865 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6301   24/05/1924
War Dept. 710   20/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22021
To Service During 01/1919
Taken into Stock 24/05/1924
Withdrawal Sat 20/09/1941 off Heaton (HTN)
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 710 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 24/05/1924
ARD Ardsley 17/04/1939
LIN Lincoln 06/07/1939
HTN Heaton 28/02/1940
   Withdrawn 20/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1963)
07/02/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 811)
28/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1491)
22/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1215)
01/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1265)
05/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1951)
06/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 857)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 24/05/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6301
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1926 31/12/1926 49 days General  
Gorton Works 16/03/1929 20/04/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 24/01/1931 07/02/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1933 28/01/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1491 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1934 22/09/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1936 01/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1938 05/11/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1941 06/09/1941 11 days General
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1963
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22021
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2865    
08/1921 Allocation      
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6301
   
24/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926.    
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929.    
24/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1931. Dep: 07/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
   
21/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1933. Dep: 28/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1491 (Diagram 15)
   
15/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15)
   
15/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
   
17/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
06/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
28/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
27/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 710 from Heaton (HTN)    
20/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 710    

prev prev