|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/03/1924 | 24/05/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6301 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1926 | 31/12/1926 | 49 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1929 | 20/04/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1931 | 07/02/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1933 | 28/01/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1491 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1934 | 22/09/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1936 | 01/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1941 | 06/09/1941 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1963 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22021 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2865 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
15/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6301 |
||
24/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/05/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
13/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. | ||
16/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929. | ||
24/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1931. Dep: 07/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1933. Dep: 28/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1491 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
06/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
27/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 710 from Heaton (HTN) | ||
20/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 710 |