Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1969 m/e 02/1919
LNWR 2875 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6303   24/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3832   22/09/1946
BR 63832 w/e 01/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1919
O4/815/02/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22027
To Service During 02/1919
Taken into Stock 24/05/1924
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 2/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 20/05/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 29/04/1945
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
40B Immingham 20/05/1951
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
36C Frodingham 03/12/1961
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1238)
07/05/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1600)
13/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1179)
19/08/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1200)
24/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 860)
07/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1467)
20/01/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1133)
14/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1291)
31/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3310)
21/06/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3214)
05/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22256)
10/04/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22249)
15/02/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28288)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 24/05/1924 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6303
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1927 07/05/1927 71 days General
Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1929 04/05/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 23/05/1931 13/06/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1933 19/08/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1935 24/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1937 07/08/1937 22 days General
Boiler number C1467 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1940 20/01/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1942 14/11/1942 17 days General
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1945 31/03/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1947 21/06/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1949 01/10/1949 22 days General
Renumbered to BR 63832
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1950 14/10/1950 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 15/03/1952 05/04/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1954 10/04/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22249 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1954 14/04/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 04/01/1958 15/02/1958 43 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28288 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1969
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22027
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2875    
08/1921 Allocation      
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6303
   
20/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
26/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15)
   
06/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929.    
23/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1933. Dep: 19/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15)
   
10/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
   
17/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1467 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1940. Dep: 20/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
   
29/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
   
10/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15)
   
29/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3832    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
10/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63832
   
07/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950.    
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1952. Dep: 05/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22249 (Diagram 15)
   
12/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1954. Dep: 14/04/1954.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
04/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1958. Dep: 15/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28288 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63832 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev