|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/04/1924 | 24/05/1924 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6303 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1927 | 07/05/1927 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1929 | 04/05/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1931 | 13/06/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1933 | 19/08/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1935 | 24/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/07/1937 | 07/08/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number C1467 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1940 | 20/01/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1942 | 14/11/1942 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1945 | 31/03/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 22 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63832 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1950 | 14/10/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1952 | 05/04/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22249 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1954 | 14/04/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1958 | 15/02/1958 | 43 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28288 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1969 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22027 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2875 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6303 |
||
20/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/05/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
26/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929. | ||
23/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1933. Dep: 19/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1467 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1940. Dep: 20/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
22/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3832 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
10/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63832 |
||
07/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950. | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
15/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1952. Dep: 05/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
20/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22249 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1954. Dep: 14/04/1954. | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
04/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1958. Dep: 15/02/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28288 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63832 from Frodingham (36C) |