Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 315 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6678 Week
» 9260 Month
» 273893 Year
» 1495458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1971 m/e 02/1919
LNER (1924) 6531   20/06/1925
LNER (1946) 3833   09/12/1946
BR 63833 w/e 20/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22029
To Service During 02/1919
Taken into Stock 20/06/1925
Withdrawal Fri 19/01/1962 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 42 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1919
GOR Gorton 19/06/1925
DON Doncaster 11/07/1925
CLK Colwick 07/09/1943
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
MEX Mexborough 18/08/1946
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn 19/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
WDN   19/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1856)
14/12/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1864)
14/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 813)
30/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1146)
05/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1837)
12/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3351)
11/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3350)
22/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1039)
13/10/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1968)
20/03/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1081)
03/02/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22161)
04/04/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22108)
27/08/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22144)
14/06/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22237)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 20/06/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6531
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1927 29/10/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 23/11/1929 14/12/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1931 14/11/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 30/06/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1936 05/09/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1938 12/11/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1941 11/01/1941 8 days General
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1943 22/05/1943 9 days General
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1945 13/10/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1948 20/03/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63833
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1951 03/02/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22161 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1951 19/02/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/03/1953 04/04/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22108 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1953 08/04/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/08/1955 27/08/1955 22 days General
Briquette tube feeder
Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1958 14/06/1958 43 days General
Boiler number 22237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1962 13/01/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1971
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22029
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6531
   
19/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/06/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
11/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.    
23/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
   
24/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
   
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15)
   
22/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15)
   
29/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 12/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
   
04/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 11/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
09/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3833    
28/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1948. Dep: 20/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63833
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
20/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22161 (Diagram 15)
   
18/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1951. Dep: 19/02/1951.    
14/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1953. Dep: 04/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22108 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 08/04/1953.    
06/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Briquette tube feeder
Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1958. Dep: 14/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22237 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/01/1962. Dep: 13/01/1962.    
19/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63833 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev