Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1975 m/e 10/1918
LNER (1924) 6260   22/03/1924
War Dept. 775   13/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22033
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 22/03/1924
Withdrawal Mon 13/10/1941 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 23 yrs , 13 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 775 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 22/03/1924
FRO Frodingham 21/02/1935
   Withdrawn 13/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1329)
19/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1224)
16/03/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1938)
31/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1269)
31/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1879)
22/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1249)
17/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3286)
29/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1245)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3374)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/03/1924 22/03/1924 22 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6260
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1924 19/07/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1927 26/03/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 22/12/1928 16/03/1929 85 days General
Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1932 31/12/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1879 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1934 22/12/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1937 17/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3286 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1939 29/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1940 31/12/1940 26 days General  
Gorton Works 29/09/1941 11/10/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1975
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22033
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6260
   
22/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
   
19/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 26/03/1927.    
22/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1928. Dep: 16/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15)
   
31/12/1930 Modification Diagram 15 number 1269 boiler fitted    
17/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 31/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1879 (Diagram 15)
   
15/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
03/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3286 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
   
06/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1940. Dep: 31/12/1940.    
29/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 775 from Frodingham (FRO)    
13/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 775    

prev prev