Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 708 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4529 Week
» 21865 Month
» 299661 Year
» 1184042 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1978 m/e 10/1918
LNWR 2885 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6522   27/02/1926
LNER (1946) 3836   24/11/1946
BR 63836 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1918
O4/821/10/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22036
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 27/02/1926
Withdrawal Wed 29/04/1964 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
Service Life 45 yrs, 6 mths , 30 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Smiths, Ecclesfleld, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 25/02/1926
CLK Colwick 05/03/1926
LNG Langwith Junction 25/02/1935
MAR March 20/11/1936
CAM Cambridge 22/12/1947
DON Doncaster 01/12/1949
IMM Immingham 18/12/1949
36D Barnsley 02/02/1958
36C Frodingham 25/10/1959
   Withdrawn 29/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   29/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1085)
10/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1289)
18/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1951)
07/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3256)
02/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3336)
02/07/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
25/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1235)
22/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3392)
21/10/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5025)
26/10/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5017)
05/11/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5034)
12/04/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28376)
17/04/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28368)
29/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28879)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/01/1926 27/02/1926 38 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6522
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1929 27/04/1929 57 days General  
Gorton Works 25/04/1932 10/06/1932 47 days General
Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1934 18/08/1934 27 days General
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1936 07/08/1936 25 days General
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1938 02/07/1938 48 days General
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1940 25/05/1940 28 days General
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 06/07/1942 22/08/1942 48 days General
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1944 21/10/1944 56 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5025 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1945 07/04/1945 46 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/09/1947 26/10/1947 44 days General
Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1949 05/11/1949 38 days General
Boiler number 5034 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63836
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1949 11/11/1949 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 07/03/1952 12/04/1952 37 days General
Boiler number 28376 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1952 24/04/1952 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/03/1954 17/04/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 28368 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1957 29/06/1957 50 days General
Boiler number 28879 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1961 21/10/1961 36 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1978
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22036
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2885    
08/1921 Allocation      
21/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1926. Dep: 27/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6522
   
25/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/02/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1929. Dep: 27/04/1929.    
25/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1932. Dep: 10/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
   
25/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
14/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1936. Dep: 07/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
   
20/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
16/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
28/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
   
27/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5025 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945.    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3836    
13/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1947. Dep: 26/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
29/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5034 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63836
   
09/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 11/11/1949.    
01/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
07/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1952. Dep: 12/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28376 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1952. Dep: 24/04/1952.    
22/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28368 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28879 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
25/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
16/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1961. Dep: 21/10/1961.    
29/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63836 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev