Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1979 m/e 11/1918
LNWR 2893 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6523   23/01/1926
LNER (1946) 3837   21/09/1946
BR 63837 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1918
O4/827/02/1954
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22037
To Service During 11/1918
Taken into Stock 23/01/1926
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 44 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 3/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 21/01/1926
LNG Langwith Junction 30/01/1926
GOR Gorton 06/12/1936
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 19/11/1938
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 22/11/1938
FRO Frodingham 03/03/1939
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
MEX Mexborough 29/12/1946
LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
40D Tuxford 25/03/1951
40E Langwith Junction 20/05/1951
40B Immingham 24/07/1955
40E Colwick 23/09/1962
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough 29/12/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
ALLOC 40D Tuxford m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1087)
14/12/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1461)
16/01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1153)
30/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1180)
30/06/1934 Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
30/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3240)
17/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1176)
18/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3337)
30/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3427)
21/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1270)
18/12/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1065)
13/10/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22217)
27/02/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28849)
08/09/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28375)
18/04/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28382)
18/04/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/11/1925 23/01/1926 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6523
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1928 07/07/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 23/11/1929 14/12/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1932 16/01/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 30/06/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1180 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1936 30/05/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1938 17/09/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1941 18/01/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1943 30/10/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1945 04/08/1945 8 days Light Repair
Tender only
 
Gorton Works 07/09/1946 21/09/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3837
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1948 18/12/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63837
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1951 13/10/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22217 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1954 27/02/1954 50 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1954 03/03/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 28/07/1956 08/09/1956 43 days General
Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/03/1959 18/04/1959 29 days General
Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1959 30/04/1959 4 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1979
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22037
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2893    
08/1921 Allocation      
14/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1925. Dep: 23/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6523
   
21/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/01/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
30/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
26/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1928. Dep: 07/07/1928.    
23/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 16/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
   
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1180 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
   
23/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
   
06/12/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
   
19/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
22/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
03/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
04/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 18/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3837
   
29/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
20/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63837
   
25/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
22/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22217 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28849 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1954. Dep: 03/03/1954.    
24/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
28/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28375 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
27/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959.    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63837 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev