Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 388 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6197 Week
» 13381 Month
» 321362 Year
» 1205743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1991 m/e 12/1918
LNWR 2861 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6305   05/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3839   13/10/1946
BR 63839 w/e 11/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1918
O4/704/03/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22049
To Service During 12/1918
Taken into Stock 05/04/1924
Withdrawal Fri 03/04/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 10/04/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 21/04/1924
MAR March 07/09/1944
CAM Cambridge 22/12/1947
ARD Ardsley 27/11/1949
39A Gorton 11/06/1950
39B Sheffield Darnall 08/04/1951
38A Colwick 19/06/1951
   Withdrawn 03/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC ARD Ardsley w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 09/06/1951
WDN   03/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1161)
02/06/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1368)
07/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1148)
22/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1215)
25/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1212)
17/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
17/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1090)
23/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1149)
07/02/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3261)
04/03/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3698)
08/02/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3673)
11/06/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 5102)
22/03/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22330)
25/10/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22313)
05/06/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22325)
02/02/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22307)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 05/04/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6305
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1926 03/07/1926 71 days General  
Gorton Works 28/04/1928 02/06/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1930 07/06/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1148 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1932 22/10/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1934 25/08/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1936 17/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1939 23/09/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1942 07/02/1942 15 days General
Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1944 04/03/1944 24 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3698 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1947 08/02/1947 15 days General
Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1949 11/06/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63839
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1952 22/03/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1952 25/10/1952 15 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1952 30/10/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/05/1954 05/06/1954 15 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22325 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1954 14/06/1954 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/03/1955 23/04/1955 29 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 29/12/1956 02/02/1957 36 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1959 31/03/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1991
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22049
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2861    
08/1921 Allocation      
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 05/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6305
   
05/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1926. Dep: 03/07/1926.    
28/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 02/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15)
   
10/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1148 (Diagram 15)
   
15/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1932. Dep: 22/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
16/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
   
24/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1942. Dep: 07/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3698 (Diagram 15D)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3839    
25/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
21/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1949. Dep: 11/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63839
   
27/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
11/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
19/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
01/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D)
   
11/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1952. Dep: 30/10/1952.    
22/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22325 (Diagram 15D)
   
08/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1954. Dep: 14/06/1954.    
26/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955.    
29/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1956. Dep: 02/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D)
   
31/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/03/1959. Dep: 31/03/1959.    
03/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63839 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev