Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 466 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 466 Week
» 17802 Month
» 295598 Year
» 1179979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1995 m/e 02/1919
LNWR 2949 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6302   07/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3841   24/11/1946
BR 63841 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1919
O4/817/05/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22053
To Service During 02/1919
Taken into Stock 07/06/1924
Withdrawal Sun 01/03/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 45 yrs, 1 mth , -1 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 07/06/1924
CLK Colwick 22/04/1945
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
38A Colwick 13/06/1954
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
41H Staveley (G.C.) 11/02/1962
41F Mexborough 09/09/1962
41A Sheffield Darnall 09/12/1962
41H Staveley (G.C.) 10/02/1963
   Withdrawn 01/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 10/03/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 02/03/1963
WDN   01/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1279)
28/08/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1403)
01/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1444)
14/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1362)
27/04/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1270)
19/09/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
19/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1145)
18/03/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3247)
15/11/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 924)
11/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1297)
04/01/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1941)
19/02/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3316)
14/04/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22176)
08/08/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22169)
17/05/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28894)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/05/1924 07/06/1924 12 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6302
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1926 30/12/1926 56 days General  
Gorton Works 22/06/1928 28/08/1928 68 days General
Boiler number 1403 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1930 01/12/1930 66 days General
Boiler number 1444 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1932 14/01/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1935 27/04/1935 46 days General
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1936 19/09/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1939 18/03/1939 50 days General
Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1941 15/11/1941 21 days General
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1942 14/11/1942 54 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 20/02/1944 11/03/1944 21 days General
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1946 04/01/1947 54 days General
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3841
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1949 19/02/1949 47 days General
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63841
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1951 14/04/1951 34 days General
Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1951 19/04/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/06/1953 08/08/1953 43 days General
Boiler number 22169 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1953 18/08/1953 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/02/1956 17/05/1956 83 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28894 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1958 17/01/1959 48 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 19/01/1959 10/02/1959 23 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/05/1961 13/06/1961 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 20/06/1961 24/06/1961 5 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1995
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22053
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2949    
08/1921 Allocation      
27/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/05/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6302
   
07/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1926. Dep: 30/12/1926.    
22/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1928. Dep: 28/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1403 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1930. Dep: 01/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1444 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 14/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
   
13/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
   
22/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 19/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
28/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1941. Dep: 15/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942.    
20/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
   
22/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3841
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
04/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63841
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
12/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15)
   
17/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 19/04/1951.    
27/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22169 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1953. Dep: 18/08/1953.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
25/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1956. Dep: 17/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28894 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 17/01/1959.    
19/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1959. Dep: 10/02/1959.    
15/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/05/1961. Dep: 13/06/1961.    
20/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1961. Dep: 24/06/1961.    
11/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
09/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
10/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
01/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63841 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev