Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1998 m/e 02/1919
LNER (1924) 6257   02/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3842   17/11/1946
BR (Tmp) E3842   24/01/1948
BR 63842 w/e 31/03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22056
To Service During 02/1919
Taken into Stock 02/02/1924
Withdrawal Sun 04/04/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 5/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 02/02/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 22/10/1926
CLK Colwick 04/01/1937
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
MEX Mexborough 18/08/1946
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn 04/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 04/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1188)
13/06/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1131)
16/11/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1440)
20/02/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 932)
04/11/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1328)
27/02/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1017)
27/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
13/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1182)
09/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1239)
27/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3425)
30/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3424)
24/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1134)
31/03/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22171)
06/06/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22120)
20/08/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22287)
10/02/1961 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22115)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/01/1924 02/02/1924 7 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6257
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1924 13/06/1924 63 days General
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1926 14/10/1926 88 days General  
Gorton Works 10/08/1928 16/11/1928 99 days General
Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1931 20/02/1931 40 days General
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1933 04/11/1933 69 days General
Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1936 27/02/1936 37 days General
Boiler number 1017 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1938 13/08/1938 58 days General
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1940 09/11/1940 31 days General
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1943 27/02/1943 42 days General
Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1945 30/06/1945 44 days General
Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1947 24/01/1948 49 days General
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3842
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1951 31/03/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63842
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1952 20/09/1952 19 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/05/1953 06/06/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 22120 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1955 20/08/1955 45 days General
Boiler number 22287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1957 12/10/1957 34 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 28/10/1960 10/02/1961 106 days General
Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1998
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22056
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
27/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1924. Dep: 02/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6257
   
02/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
12/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 13/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
   
19/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1926. Dep: 14/10/1926.    
22/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1928. Dep: 16/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15)
   
12/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1931. Dep: 20/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
   
28/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15)
   
22/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1936. Dep: 27/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1017 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
04/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15)
   
10/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
   
17/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3842    
07/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1947. Dep: 24/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3842
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
22/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63842
   
02/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952.    
11/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22120 (Diagram 15)
   
07/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22287 (Diagram 15)
   
09/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/09/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957.    
28/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1960. Dep: 10/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15)
   
04/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63842 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev