Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2000 m/e 02/1919
LNER (1924) 6612   11/08/1928
LNER (1946) 3843   24/11/1946
BR (Tmp) E3843   24/01/1948
BR 63843 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1919
O4/703/02/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22058
To Service During 02/1919
Taken into Stock 11/08/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/11/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 46 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox and Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 12/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates 11/08/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 23/10/1929
WHL West Hartlepool 11/05/1940
HLD Hull Dairycoates 05/03/1945
53E Cudworth 20/08/1950
53A Hull Dairycoates 01/01/1951
36A Doncaster 02/09/1951
36B Mexborough 28/10/1951
41J Langwith Junction 01/03/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 07/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53E Cudworth w/e 20/08/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/01/1951
LOAN 36A Doncaster 02/09/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   w/e 07/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1064)
24/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1188)
03/11/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1301)
27/02/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1286)
03/02/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3660)
28/03/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3663)
21/08/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3696)
01/06/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3671)
24/01/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3682)
05/11/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3662)
10/01/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22302)
23/06/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22300)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/05/1928 11/08/1928 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6612
 
Darlington Works 30/08/1930 25/10/1930 57 days General  
Gorton Works 10/12/1932 24/01/1933 46 days General
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1934 03/11/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1937 27/02/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1939 03/02/1940 53 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1942 28/03/1942 36 days General
Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1943 21/08/1943 15 days Heavy
Boiler number 3696 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1946 01/06/1946 65 days General
Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1947 21/01/1948 44 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 15/09/1949 05/11/1949 52 days General
Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63843
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1952 10/01/1953 26 days General
Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1956 23/06/1956 53 days General
Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1960 21/01/1961 39 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2000
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22058
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 11/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6612
   
11/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/08/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
23/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
30/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 25/10/1930.    
10/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1932. Dep: 24/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 03/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
   
13/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1939. Dep: 03/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D)
   
11/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
21/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D)
   
07/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/08/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3696 (Diagram 15D)
   
05/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
29/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D)
   
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3843    
09/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/12/1947. Dep: 21/01/1948.    
24/01/1948 Modification Diagram 15D number 3682 boiler fitted    
24/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to E3843    
15/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63843
   
20/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (53E)    
01/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
28/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
16/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D)
   
14/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/12/1960. Dep: 21/01/1961.    
01/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
07/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63843 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev