Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 204 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 6916 Week
» 20020 Month
» 20020 Year
» 1241585 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2001 m/e 02/1919
LNER (1924) 6613   30/06/1928
War Dept. 749   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22059
To Service During 02/1919
Taken into Stock 30/06/1928
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Heaton (HTN)
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 749 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow, 18/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates 30/06/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 27/09/1929
DAR Darlington 06/01/1940
HTN Heaton 24/02/1940
   Withdrawn 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1955)
24/09/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1158)
11/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1315)
17/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1206)
20/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3268)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3267)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/04/1928 30/06/1928 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6613
 
Darlington Works 22/04/1930 31/07/1930 101 days General  
Gorton Works 17/09/1932 24/09/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1933 11/02/1933 29 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 21/07/1934 11/08/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1936 17/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1939 20/05/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3268 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1941 27/09/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 749
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2001
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22059
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6613
   
30/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
30/06/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
27/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
22/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1930. Dep: 31/07/1930.    
17/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15)
   
14/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 11/02/1933.    
21/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1934. Dep: 11/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
   
06/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3268 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
24/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
13/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 749
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 749 from Heaton (HTN)    

prev prev