Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2005 m/e 01/1919
GCR 1   15/06/1919
LNER (1924) 5001   26/08/1925
LNER (1946) 3626   01/12/1946
BR 63626 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 653
To Service During 01/1919
Withdrawal Thu 22/06/1961 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 42 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 05/08/1921
MEX Mexborough 31/01/1924
DON Doncaster m/e 1930
CLK Colwick 24/11/1933
IMM Immingham 30/12/1938
GRA Grantham 07/05/1941
MEX Mexborough 21/11/1942
IMM Immingham 16/09/1945
FRO Frodingham 12/05/1946
   Withdrawn 22/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   22/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1756)
26/08/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1749)
10/04/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1298)
26/02/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 856)
18/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1328)
18/03/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
23/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3338)
14/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 868)
12/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3260)
09/02/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3300)
31/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1236)
16/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22106)
18/10/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22299)
19/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22247)
26/04/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22185)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/02/1921 24/07/1921 156 days General  
Gorton Works 20/01/1923 14/04/1923 85 days General  
Gorton Works 02/06/1925 26/08/1925 86 days General
Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5001
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1928 10/04/1928 61 days General
Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1930 22/04/1930 60 days General  
Gorton Works 25/01/1932 26/02/1932 33 days General
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1936 18/03/1936 40 days General
Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1938 23/07/1938 62 days General
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1940 14/09/1940 28 days General
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1943 12/06/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1945 09/02/1946 66 days General
Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1948 31/05/1948 50 days General
Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63626
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1950 16/09/1950 37 days General
Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1952 18/10/1952 23 days General
Boiler number 22299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1955 19/03/1955 43 days General
Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1956 15/12/1956 65 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/03/1958 26/04/1958 53 days General
Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1961 29/05/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2005
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/06/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 1    
19/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1921. Dep: 24/07/1921.    
05/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923.    
31/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1925. Dep: 26/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5001
   
10/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1928. Dep: 10/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15)
   
1930 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 22/04/1930.    
25/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1932. Dep: 26/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1936. Dep: 18/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
23/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
   
30/12/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
18/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1940. Dep: 14/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
29/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
06/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1945. Dep: 09/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15)
   
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3626    
12/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 31/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63626
   
11/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15)
   
26/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22299 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/10/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956.    
05/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15)
   
29/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/05/1961. Dep: 29/05/1961.    
22/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63626 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev