Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 236 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 236 Week
» 17572 Month
» 295368 Year
» 1179749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2006 m/e 03/1919
GCR 5   15/06/1919
LNER (1924) 5005   03/04/1926
LNER (1946) 3627   22/12/1946
BR 63627 w/e 02/07/1949
War Dept. 044   22/02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 653
To Service During 03/1919
Withdrawal Fri 22/02/1952 off Langwith Junction (40E)
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 044 and sent to Egypt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 17/03/1922
MEX Mexborough 02/02/1924
IMM Immingham 20/10/1926
DON Doncaster 24/12/1926
FRO Frodingham 05/02/1934
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
36B Mexborough 27/08/1950
40E Langwith Junction 10/09/1950
   Withdrawn 22/02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 10/09/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1757)
15/09/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1454)
20/04/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1159)
11/04/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 111)
16/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1941)
25/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3229)
25/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
25/01/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
18/12/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1273)
09/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3387)
18/04/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 858)
10/06/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3309)
17/08/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3219)
02/07/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3326)
23/02/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22245)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/03/1921 16/04/1921 43 days General  
Gorton Works 30/06/1923 15/09/1923 78 days General
Boiler number 1454 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1926 03/04/1926 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5005
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1929 20/04/1929 92 days General
Boiler number 1159 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/03/1931 11/04/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1933 16/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1936 25/01/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1937 18/12/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 09/03/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1942 18/04/1942 10 days General
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1944 10/06/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1946 17/08/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1949 02/07/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63627
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1952 23/02/1952 22 days General
Converted to Oil Fuel
Boiler number 22245 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 044
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2006
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/06/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 5    
05/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1921. Dep: 16/04/1921.    
17/03/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1923. Dep: 15/09/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1454 (Diagram 15)
   
02/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
06/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5005
   
20/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1159 (Diagram 15)
   
21/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
18/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1936. Dep: 25/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
11/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
   
24/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3627    
04/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63627
   
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
02/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Converted to Oil Fuel
Boiler number 22245 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 044
   
22/02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 044 from Langwith Junction (40E)    

prev prev