Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2007 m/e 03/1919
GCR 8   15/06/1919
LNER (1924) 5008   20/05/1926
LNER (1946) 3628   24/11/1946
BR 63628 w/e 03/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/103/1919
O4/518/06/1932
O4/812/02/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 653
To Service During 03/1919
Withdrawal Sun 05/09/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 16/06/1922
MEX Mexborough 01/02/1924
NWE New England 18/10/1933
CLK Colwick 15/11/1935
WHL West Hartlepool 03/09/1942
NPT Newport (Teeside) 05/10/1944
WHL West Hartlepool 18/10/1944
HLS Hull Springhead 12/01/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates 29/04/1946
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 02/09/1951
38A Colwick 23/09/1951
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
36C Frodingham 03/12/1961
   Withdrawn 05/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 02/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   w/e 05/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1758)
21/09/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1746)
20/05/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1117)
15/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1073)
18/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 615)
15/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 639)
31/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1084)
04/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 621)
06/12/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 615)
11/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 639)
03/07/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3655)
12/02/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 28831)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/01/1921 23/03/1921 68 days General  
Gorton Works 30/06/1923 21/09/1923 84 days General
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1926 20/05/1926 87 days General
Boiler number 1117 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5008
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1928 11/10/1928 67 days General  
Gorton Works 16/05/1930 15/07/1930 61 days General
Boiler number 1073 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1932 18/06/1932 60 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1935 15/11/1935 45 days General
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1937 31/07/1937 25 days General
Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1939 04/11/1939 45 days General
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1941 06/12/1941 53 days General
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1942 15/08/1942 47 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 12/02/1944 11/03/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1946 31/08/1946 52 days General  
Gorton Works 02/06/1948 03/07/1948 32 days Heavy
Boiler number 3655 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63628
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1951 22/09/1951 40 days General  
Gorton Works 07/07/1952 04/10/1952 90 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 1955 12/02/1955   General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1958 11/10/1958 40 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2007
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/06/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 8    
15/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1921. Dep: 23/03/1921.    
16/06/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1923. Dep: 21/09/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
23/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1926. Dep: 20/05/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1117 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5008
   
06/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1928. Dep: 11/10/1928.    
16/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1930. Dep: 15/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1073 (Diagram 15)
   
20/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1933 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
02/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1935. Dep: 15/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15)
   
15/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15)
   
15/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/06/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942.    
03/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
12/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
18/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
12/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
29/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3628    
02/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/06/1948. Dep: 03/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3655 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63628
   
14/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951.    
02/09/1951 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
23/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
07/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/07/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952.    
1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 15)
   
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
02/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1958. Dep: 11/10/1958.    
03/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
05/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63628 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev