Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 54 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5562 Week
» 26464 Month
» 26464 Year
» 1248029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1643 m/e 05/1919
LNER (1924) 6311   12/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3720   26/05/1946
BR 63720 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1919
O4/823/02/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E108
Works Number 3751
To Service During 05/1919
Taken into Stock 12/04/1924
Withdrawal Thu 05/03/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 10/04/1924
DON Doncaster 23/10/1924
NWE New England 19/01/1926
CLK Colwick 11/11/1933
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
STV Staveley (G.C.) 12/03/1944
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 08/02/1948
STV Staveley (G.C.) 13/06/1948
41F Mexborough 04/12/1960
41J Langwith Junction 03/09/1961
   Withdrawn 05/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   05/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1404)
09/10/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1481)
23/12/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1211)
30/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1859)
24/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 868)
23/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1886)
08/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3223)
06/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3336)
04/11/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3328)
15/02/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3417)
02/10/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 862)
08/09/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22214)
25/02/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22194)
23/02/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28928)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 12/04/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6311
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1924 09/10/1924 99 days General
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1927 06/07/1927 52 days General  
Gorton Works 23/10/1929 23/12/1929 62 days General
Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1930 15/02/1930 25 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 21/06/1932 30/07/1932 40 days General
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1935 24/10/1935 45 days General
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1938 23/04/1938 35 days General
Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1940 08/06/1940 20 days General
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 14/12/1942 06/02/1943 55 days General
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1944 04/11/1944 25 days General
Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1946 15/02/1947 48 days General
Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1948 02/10/1948 46 days General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63720
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1949 03/09/1949 21 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/08/1951 08/09/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1952 31/01/1953 72 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/01/1954 25/02/1954 28 days General
Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1956 23/02/1957 65 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28928 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1957 23/03/1957 26 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/02/1960 16/03/1960 21 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/03/1962 07/04/1962 34 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1643
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3751
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6311
   
10/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
03/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1924. Dep: 09/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15)
   
23/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
16/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1927. Dep: 06/07/1927.    
23/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1929. Dep: 23/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 15)
   
22/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930.    
21/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1932. Dep: 30/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1935. Dep: 24/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1938. Dep: 23/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
   
14/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1942. Dep: 06/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
11/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
   
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3720    
30/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1946. Dep: 15/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
13/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
18/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63720
   
14/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949.    
02/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1952. Dep: 31/01/1953.    
29/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1954. Dep: 25/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15)
   
21/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1956. Dep: 23/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28928 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1957. Dep: 23/03/1957.    
25/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1960. Dep: 16/03/1960.    
04/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
03/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
05/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/03/1962. Dep: 07/04/1962.    
18/03/1962 Sightings Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
05/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63720 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev