Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 82 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1116 Week
» 23622 Month
» 326812 Year
» 1548377 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1645 m/e 06/1919
London and North Western Railway 2858 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6331   07/06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3721   09/09/1946
British Railways 63721 w/e 13/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/810/04/1954
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E108
Works Number 3753
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 07/06/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1919
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton on 05/06/1924
CLK Colwick on 03/06/1945
DON Doncaster on 24/11/1946
CLK Colwick on 01/12/1946
ANN Annesley on 23/05/1948
CLK Colwick on 19/09/1948
ANN Annesley on 04/12/1949
39A Gorton on 22/10/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster on 24/11/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 01/12/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 25/09/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 28/10/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   m/e 30/04/1959
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1213)
13/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1873)
02/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1886)
29/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 117)
10/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1120)
10/08/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
28/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 934)
28/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1133)
26/05/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3242)
18/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1858)
13/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3219)
19/01/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22235)
10/04/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28856)
20/10/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28340)
17/12/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28448)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 07/06/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6331
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1927 30/04/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 18/05/1929 13/07/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1931 02/05/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1933 29/07/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1935 10/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1937 28/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1939 16/12/1939 15 days General  
Gorton Works 16/11/1942 28/12/1942 43 days General
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1945 26/05/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1947 18/10/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1949 13/08/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63721
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1951 19/01/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1952 24/01/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/02/1954 10/04/1954 50 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1956 20/10/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 28340 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1958 24/05/1958 33 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 31/01/1959 21/02/1959 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/11/1960 17/12/1960 43 days General
Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1959 Swindon Works (Scrapyard) Scrapyard1401/23/9/37/56/7/57, 2254, 2812/23/5/30/3, 4200/26/61, 4377, 4540/53/84, 5315/55/82/6/8/90, 5566, 5703/8/33/43, 5810, 6318/22/8/31/4/54, 6409/28, 6721/3/7/43, 7738. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1645
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3753
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2858    
08/1921 Allocation      
29/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6331
   
05/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
19/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927.    
18/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
   
18/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
   
27/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
14/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939.    
16/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1942. Dep: 28/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
   
05/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
   
03/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3721    
24/11/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
01/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63721
   
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
29/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1951. Dep: 19/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15)
   
22/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1952. Dep: 24/01/1952.    
20/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1956. Dep: 20/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28340 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 24/05/1958.    
31/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1959. Dep: 21/02/1959.    
05/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63721 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev