Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1090 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8544 Week
» 11126 Month
» 275759 Year
» 1497324 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1727 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6560   07/04/1928
War Dept. 708   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L1550
Works Number 1283
To Service During 09/1919
Taken into Stock 10/04/1928
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 22 yrs , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 708 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1919
MEX Mexborough on 10/04/1928
ANN Annesley on 23/02/1929
   Withdrawn on 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 863)
21/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1946)
06/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1058)
07/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1493)
23/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3378)
02/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3363)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/01/1928 07/04/1928 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6560
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1930 14/06/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/01/1933 21/01/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1946 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1935 06/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1058 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1937 07/08/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1939 23/09/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3378 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1941 02/08/1941 10 days General
Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1727
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1283
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
28/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1928. Dep: 07/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6560
   
10/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/04/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
23/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
10/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 14/06/1930.    
14/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 21/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1946 (Diagram 15)
   
22/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1058 (Diagram 15)
   
17/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3378 (Diagram 15)
   
24/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 708 from Annesley (ANN)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 708    

prev prev