Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 135 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2120 Week
» 9304 Month
» 317285 Year
» 1201666 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1728 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6561   03/09/1927
LNER (1946) 3641   15/01/1947
BR 63641 w/e 17/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/309/1919
O4/801/06/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L1550
Works Number 1284
To Service During 09/1919
Taken into Stock 31/08/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 31/08/1927
DON Doncaster 24/02/1930
FRO Frodingham 13/09/1939
CLK Colwick 24/12/1944
ANN Annesley 23/05/1948
39A Gorton 16/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 16/07/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1171)
31/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 820)
24/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1462)
04/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1130)
04/07/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
24/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3343)
07/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3221)
26/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 868)
19/05/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 949)
15/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3425)
24/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22272)
16/10/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22221)
01/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28830)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/05/1927 03/09/1927 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6561
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 22/02/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 19/12/1931 31/12/1931 13 days General
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1934 24/03/1934 15 days General
Spring gear altered for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1936 04/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 24/09/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1940 07/12/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1943 26/06/1943 26 days General
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1945 19/05/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1946 18/05/1946 26 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 18/10/1947 15/11/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1949 17/12/1949 15 days General
Renumbered to BR 63641
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1949 26/12/1949 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/09/1950 23/09/1950 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 13/11/1950 18/11/1950 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 10/05/1952 24/05/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22272 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1952 30/05/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/09/1954 16/10/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1955 12/11/1955 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/04/1957 01/06/1957 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1960 05/03/1960 36 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1728
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1284
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
28/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 03/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6561
   
31/08/1927 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
31/08/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
18/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930.    
24/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
   
10/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Spring gear altered for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15)
   
20/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
27/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
30/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 07/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
   
23/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946.    
15/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3641    
18/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 15/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
03/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63641
   
20/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1949. Dep: 26/12/1949.    
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
16/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950.    
13/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1950. Dep: 18/11/1950.    
10/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22272 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1952. Dep: 30/05/1952.    
25/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955.    
27/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1960. Dep: 05/03/1960.    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63641 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev