Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 730 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3873 Week
» 14043 Month
» 291839 Year
» 1176220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1729 m/e 07/1919
LNER (1924) 6538   10/10/1925
LNER (1946) 3642   13/12/1946
BR 63642 w/e 18/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L1550
Works Number 1285
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 10/10/1925
Withdrawal Wed 18/11/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 06/10/1925
IMM Immingham 15/10/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 10/04/1930
LNG Langwith Junction 27/09/1930
FRO Frodingham 12/03/1939
   Withdrawn 18/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   18/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1034)
26/11/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1837)
02/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1131)
25/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1247)
01/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1176)
01/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
20/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3341)
04/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3316)
02/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1212)
04/08/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3258)
25/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3339)
18/02/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3427)
26/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22262)
19/06/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22255)
09/02/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22178)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/05/1925 10/10/1925 134 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6538
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1927 26/11/1927 36 days General
Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1930 12/04/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 19/03/1932 02/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1934 25/08/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1936 01/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1938 20/08/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3341 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1940 04/01/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1943 02/10/1943 16 days General
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1945 04/08/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1947 25/10/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1950 18/02/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63642
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1952 26/04/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1954 19/06/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22255 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1954 24/06/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/01/1957 09/02/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1959 12/11/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1729
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1285
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6538
   
06/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
22/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15)
   
15/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930.    
10/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
27/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
19/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
13/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3341 (Diagram 15)
   
12/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
14/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
   
21/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
   
13/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3642    
04/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
   
04/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1950. Dep: 18/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63642
   
05/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15)
   
29/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22255 (Diagram 15)
   
22/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1954. Dep: 24/06/1954.    
12/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15)
   
12/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/11/1959. Dep: 12/11/1959.    
18/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63642 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev