Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2044 m/e 05/1919
LNWR 2836 m/e 09/1919
GCR 1256c   29/12/1923
LNER (1924) 6256   10/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3846   17/11/1946
BR 63846 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22138
To Service During 05/1919
Taken into Stock 29/12/1923
Withdrawal Tue 02/06/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
Service Life 45 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Smiths, Ecclesfield, 8/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 20/12/1923
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 16/05/1924
SHF Sheffield Darnall 11/04/1943
41F Mexborough 16/06/1963
41J Langwith Junction 01/03/1964
   Withdrawn 02/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   02/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1139)
10/05/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1967)
27/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1885)
06/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1881)
03/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1773)
19/03/1938 Intensifore lubricator removed
19/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1858)
19/03/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
05/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3224)
27/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1002)
16/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3355)
17/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3283)
24/02/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22165)
21/04/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22878)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 29/12/1923 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1256c
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1924 10/05/1924 74 days General
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6256
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1926 18/12/1926 67 days General  
Gorton Works 04/02/1929 30/03/1929 55 days General  
Gorton Works 29/11/1930 27/01/1931 60 days General
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1933 06/05/1933 55 days General
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1935 03/08/1935 41 days General
Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1938 19/03/1938 23 days General
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1940 05/10/1940 25 days General
Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1943 27/03/1943 50 days General
Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1946 16/03/1946 55 days General
Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1948 17/06/1948 46 days General
Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63846
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1951 24/02/1951 30 days General
Boiler number 22165 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1953 22/08/1953 24 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 08/03/1956 21/04/1956 45 days General
Boiler number 22878 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1960 19/05/1960 51 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2044
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22138
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2836    
08/1921 Allocation      
20/12/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 29/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1256c
   
29/12/1923 To Stock To GCR stock    
27/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6256
   
16/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
13/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1926. Dep: 18/12/1926.    
04/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1929. Dep: 30/03/1929.    
29/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 27/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
   
13/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
   
24/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1935. Dep: 03/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
   
25/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
11/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
21/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3846    
03/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 17/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63846
   
26/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22165 (Diagram 15)
   
30/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/07/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953.    
08/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22878 (Diagram 15)
   
30/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/03/1960. Dep: 19/05/1960.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
01/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
02/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63846 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev